TN SB2559 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 723
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 723
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, removes the limitation that a passenger car or passenger motor vehicle have a manufacturer's gross vehicle weight rating of 8,500 pounds or less in order to be subject to the mandatory seat belt law. - Amends TCA Section 55-9-603.
Title
As enacted, removes the limitation that a passenger car or passenger motor vehicle have a manufacturer's gross vehicle weight rating of 8,500 pounds or less in order to be subject to the mandatory seat belt law. - Amends TCA Section 55-9-603.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] | Sen. Bill Ketron [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 723 | |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/21/2016 |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/8/2016 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1555 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 723
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2559&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB2559.pdf |