TN SB2557 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes from November 1 to October 15 the deadline for the comptroller to annually submit a report concerning the implementation of the Tennessee Literacy Success Act. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 37; Title 49; Title 50; Title 66 and Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 37; Title 49; Title 50; Title 66 and Title 67, relative to education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 3 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 2 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 75 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 80 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 2 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 75 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 80 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 27, Nays 3, PNV 1 (Amendment 3 - HA1083) |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 27, Nays 3, PNV 1 (Amendment 2 - HA1082) |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar 2 for 4/24/2024 |
2024-04-23 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 80, Nays 18, PNV 0 |
2024-04-23 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 3 - HA1083) |
2024-04-23 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA1082) |
2024-04-23 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0863) |
2024-04-23 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-04-08 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 25, Nays 0, PNV 4 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0789) |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/4/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/13/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2678 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-23 - Sponsor(s) Added.