TN SB2551 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-24 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-24 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes issuance of a disabled veteran registration plate without payment of a fee to a veteran with a service-connected disability that is determined by the United States department of veterans affairs to be permanent and total due to individual unemployability. - Amends TCA Section 55-4-256.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 55-4-256, relative to disabled veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0601) |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/21/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2322 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee