TN SB2549 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 1012
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 1012
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, under certain conditions, exempts from use tax, persons who purchased and registered a boat in another state, relocated to Tennessee, and brought the boat into Tennessee for personal use. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As enacted, under certain conditions, exempts from use tax, persons who purchased and registered a boat in another state, relocated to Tennessee, and brought the boat into Tennessee for personal use. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | House | Pub. Ch. 1012 |
2014-06-03 | House | Effective date(s) 07/01/2014 |
2014-05-22 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2014-05-13 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2014-05-07 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-05-01 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-24 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-04-16 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2014-04-16 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Passed S., Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 3/25/2014 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 3/25/2014 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Ref. to S. F,W&M Comm. w/recommend |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/4/2014 |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Ref. to S. Tax Sub Comm. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2402 (Crossfiled) 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1012