TN SB2535 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, defines "life" for statutory construction purposes to mean the condition that distinguishes animals and plants from inorganic matter, including the capacity for growth, reproduction, functional activity, and continual change preceding death; excludes from the definition artificial intelligence, a computer algorithm, a software program, computer hardware, or any type of machine. - Amends TCA Title 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 1, relative to life.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/11/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2817 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee