TN SB2531 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Pub. Ch. 636
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, defines the term "putative father"; makes various changes to the termination of parental rights of a putative father. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 1, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, defines the term "putative father"; makes various changes to the termination of parental rights of a putative father. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 1, Part 1.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-31 Pub. Ch. 636
2016-03-31 Effective date(s) 03/23/2016
2016-03-23SenateSigned by Governor.
2016-03-15SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2016-03-15HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2016-03-14SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2016-03-14SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2016-03-10HousePassed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0
2016-03-10HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2016-02-18HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2016-02-17SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2016-02-17SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2016-02-12SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2016-02-11SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 2/17/2016
2016-02-09SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2016-02-04SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/9/2016
2016-01-25SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2016-01-21SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2016-01-21SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1531 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-31 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 636

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback