TN SB2530 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-08 - Pub. Ch. 679
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-08 - Pub. Ch. 679
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates the reasonable and prudent parent standard to be used by a caregiver when determining whether to allow a foster child to participate in activities; exempts a caregiver acting in compliance with the standard from civil liability relating to injuries the child may incur in such activities. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 2, Part 4.
Title
As enacted, creates the reasonable and prudent parent standard to be used by a caregiver when determining whether to allow a foster child to participate in activities; exempts a caregiver acting in compliance with the standard from civil liability relating to injuries the child may incur in such activities. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 2, Part 4.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Bill Ketron [R] |
Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | Pub. Ch. 679 | |
2016-04-08 | Effective date(s) 03/29/2016 | |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2016-03-21 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2016-03-17 | House | Passed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2016-03-17 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2016-02-18 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 2/17/2016 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/9/2016 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1530 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 679