TN SB2527 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-07 - Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 2/14/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-07 - Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 2/14/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that criminal injury compensation funds made to minors be turned over to chancery or circuit court to be placed in an interest bearing account. - Amends TCA Title 16; Title 29 and Title 34.
Title
As introduced, requires that criminal injury compensation funds made to minors be turned over to chancery or circuit court to be placed in an interest bearing account. - Amends TCA Title 16; Title 29 and Title 34.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Barnes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-07 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 2/14/2012 | |
2012-02-02 | Withdrawn. | |
2012-02-02 | Recalled from S. Jud. Comm. | |
2012-02-01 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/7/2012 | |
2012-01-23 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2012-01-19 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-18 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3056 (Crossfiled) 2012-02-06 - Withdrawn.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2527&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB2527.pdf |