TN SB2520 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1033
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1033
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, excludes from coverage under the Tennessee Heritage Protection Act of 2016 memorials under the control of an accredited museum, public library, or public archive in certain circumstances; revises other provisions of the Act. - Amends TCA Section 4-1-412.
Title
As enacted, excludes from coverage under the Tennessee Heritage Protection Act of 2016 memorials under the control of an accredited museum, public library, or public archive in certain circumstances; revises other provisions of the Act. - Amends TCA Section 4-1-412.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] | Sen. Paul Bailey [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] | Sen. Frank Niceley [R] |
Sen. Steve Southerland [R] | Sen. Joseph Hensley [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-23 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1033 | |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/25/2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee / Behind Budget |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/13/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1574 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1033