TN SB2508 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Pub. Ch. 661
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, specifies that nothing in the present law that applies generally to post-employment benefits for public officers and employees prohibits a local education agency from participating in any other post-employment benefits investment trust created pursuant to the Other Post-Employment Benefit Investment Trust Act of 2006. - Amends TCA Title 8.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, specifies that nothing in the present law that applies generally to post-employment benefits for public officers and employees prohibits a local education agency from participating in any other post-employment benefits investment trust created pursuant to the Other Post-Employment Benefit Investment Trust Act of 2006. - Amends TCA Title 8.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-06 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11 Pub. Ch. 661
2018-04-11 Effective date(s) 04/09/2018
2018-04-09SenateSigned by Governor.
2018-04-02SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2018-03-29HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-03-28SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-03-27SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2018-03-26HousePassed H., Ayes 96, Nays 1, PNV 0
2018-03-26HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0747)
2018-03-26HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2018-03-26HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2018-03-22SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2018-03-22SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2018-03-22SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0662)
2018-03-20SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/22/2018
2018-03-19SenateSenate Reset on calendar 3/22/18
2018-03-16SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/19/2018
2018-03-06SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/6/2018
2018-02-05SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2018-02-01SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2093 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 661

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback