TN HB2093 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 661
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, specifies that nothing in the present law that applies generally to post-employment benefits for public officers and employees prohibits a local education agency from participating in any other post-employment benefits investment trust created pursuant to the Other Post-Employment Benefit Investment Trust Act of 2006. - Amends TCA Title 8.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, specifies that nothing in the present law that applies generally to post-employment benefits for public officers and employees prohibits a local education agency from participating in any other post-employment benefits investment trust created pursuant to the Other Post-Employment Benefit Investment Trust Act of 2006. - Amends TCA Title 8.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 661
2018-03-26HouseComp. SB subst.
2018-03-22HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-22HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/26/2018
2018-03-21HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/22/2018
2018-03-20HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2018-03-14HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/20/2018
2018-03-14HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-03-07HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/14/2018
2018-03-07HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/14/2018
2018-02-28HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/7/2018
2018-02-07HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2018-02-01HouseP2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-01-31HouseIntro., P1C.
2018-01-30HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB2508 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-11 - Pub. Ch. 661

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback