TN SB2504 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 819
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 819
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Competitive Wireless Broadband Investment, Deployment, and Safety Act of 2018" and requires TACIR to study certain items relating to deployment. - Amends TCA Title 13.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Competitive Wireless Broadband Investment, Deployment, and Safety Act of 2018" and requires TACIR to study certain items relating to deployment. - Amends TCA Title 13.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] | Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. Dolores Gresham [R] | Sen. Jon Lundberg [R] |
Sen. Mark Green [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] | Sen. Frank Niceley [R] | Sen. Art Swann [R] |
Sen. Reginald Tate [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 819 | |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2018 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/13/2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/20/2018 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2279 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-04 - Pub. Ch. 819