TN SB2504 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 1008
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 1008
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires a person applying for expunction of criminal records to pay the appropriate court clerk’s fee, in addition to any other fees required unless the person is entitled to have such records removed and destroyed without cost. - Amends TCA Section 8-21-401 and Title 40.
Title
As enacted, requires a person applying for expunction of criminal records to pay the appropriate court clerk’s fee, in addition to any other fees required unless the person is entitled to have such records removed and destroyed without cost. - Amends TCA Section 8-21-401 and Title 40.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 57 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 57 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | House | Pub. Ch. 1008 |
2014-06-03 | House | Effective date(s) 05/22/2014 |
2014-05-22 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2014-05-13 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2014-05-07 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-05-01 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-28 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-04-17 | House | S. concurred in H. am. 1 |
2014-04-16 | House | Placed on Senate Message Calendar cal. for 4/17/2014 |
2014-04-16 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 57, Nays 34, PNV 1 |
2014-04-16 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA1131) |
2014-04-16 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Passed S., Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 4/10/2014 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/8/2014 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. FW&M Comm. |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/25/2014 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2372 (Crossfiled) 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1008