TN SB2498 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Effective date(s) 04/11/2024, 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Effective date(s) 04/11/2024, 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes graduates of unaccredited engineering technology curriculums to apply for and become registered as engineers, provided that such persons have prior engineering experience and meet certain examination requirements; repeals the bill on June 30, 2025. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 62, Chapter 2, Part 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4 and Title 62, Chapter 2, Part 4, relative to certificates of registration for engineers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Effective date(s) 04/11/2024, 07/01/2024 | |
2024-04-17 | Pub. Ch. 706 | |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-03-28 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-03-25 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2024-03-25 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0576) |
2024-03-25 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-03-25 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 25, Nays 0, PNV 3 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0628) |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/21/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2578 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 706