TN SB2485 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 799
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 799
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that a respondent has the right to present evidence, including testimony or other evidence from a physician, psychologist or senior psychological examiner of the respondent's choosing, and confront, as a cross-examiner, witnesses; specifies that if a court grants a protective order placing under seal the respondent's financial information, the order may not deny access to information regarding fees and expenses of the conservatorship.
Title
As enacted, specifies that a respondent has the right to present evidence, including testimony or other evidence from a physician, psychologist or senior psychological examiner of the respondent's choosing, and confront, as a cross-examiner, witnesses; specifies that if a court grants a protective order placing under seal the respondent's financial information, the order may not deny access to information regarding fees and expenses of the conservatorship.
Sponsors
Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] | Rep. Gary Odom [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 799 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA1067) |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/8/2014 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to last cal. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/4/2014 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2317 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-16 - Pub. Ch. 799