TN SB2479 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires each district attorney general to file a quarterly report with the administrative office of the courts that includes information regarding criminal proceedings within the judicial district; requires the administrative office of the courts to compile the reports into a quarterly criminal justice report; requires each law enforcement agency to file a quarterly report with the Tennessee bureau of investigation regarding law enforcement outcomes within the jurisdiction; requires the Tennessee bureau of investigation to compile the reports into a quarterly law enforcement activity report. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40, relative to criminal proceedings.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Rose [R] | Sen. Randy McNally [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/26/2024 |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2928 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee