TN SB2462 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 600
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 600
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, changes the application of interest rates to the amount financed instead of the total amount of the loan with regard to certain loans made by industrial loan and thrift companies. - Amends TCA Title 45, Chapter 5.
Title
As enacted, changes the application of interest rates to the amount financed instead of the total amount of the loan with regard to certain loans made by industrial loan and thrift companies. - Amends TCA Title 45, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-13 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/13/2018 3/6/2018 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 600 | |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/12/2018 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1944 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-04 - Pub. Ch. 600