TN HB1944 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Pub. Ch. 600
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Pub. Ch. 600
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, changes the application of interest rates to the amount financed instead of the total amount of the loan with regard to certain loans made by industrial loan and thrift companies. - Amends TCA Title 45, Chapter 5.
Title
As enacted, changes the application of interest rates to the amount financed instead of the total amount of the loan with regard to certain loans made by industrial loan and thrift companies. - Amends TCA Title 45, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Rep. Glen Casada [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Pub. Ch. 600 | |
2018-04-04 | Effective date(s) 03/23/2018 | |
2018-03-23 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-03-20 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-03-15 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-03-13 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-03-01 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed H., Ayes 86, Nays 5, PNV 1 |
2018-02-22 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/1/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/22/2018 |
2018-02-20 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 2/20/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 2/14/2018 |
2018-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2018-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-26 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2462 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 600