TN SB2458 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 23 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-07-06 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, clarifies that the current prohibition against traffic offense citation quotas is applicable to public officials or public employees; creates a Class B misdemeanor offense, subject to fine only, for officials and employees violating that prohibition. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, clarifies that the current prohibition against traffic offense citation quotas is applicable to public officials or public employees; creates a Class B misdemeanor offense, subject to fine only, for officials and employees violating that prohibition. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 1 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-06SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2020-06-30HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2020-06-30HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2020-06-23SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2020-06-23SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2020-06-17SenateConcurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0740)
2020-06-16SenatePlaced on Senate Message Calendar for 6/17/2020
2020-06-11HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0
2020-06-11HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0846)
2020-06-11HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0740)
2020-06-11HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2020-03-09HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2020-03-05SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2020-03-05SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2020-03-03SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/5/2020
2020-02-25SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2020-02-20SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/25/2020
2020-02-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2020-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2020-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2702 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-11 - Comp. SB subst.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback