TN SB2454 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 773
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 773
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes operation of Class I and Class II off-highway vehicles on three segments of state routes located in Hickman County, if such vehicles are registered, insured, and equipped with safety equipment, - Amends TCA Section 55-8-185.
Title
As enacted, authorizes operation of Class I and Class II off-highway vehicles on three segments of state routes located in Hickman County, if such vehicles are registered, insured, and equipped with safety equipment, - Amends TCA Section 55-8-185.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 773 | |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 for 6/18/2020 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/11/2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/19/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2278 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-22 - Pub. Ch. 773