TN SB2445 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Effective date(s) 04/11/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Effective date(s) 04/11/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds three persons to the state child fatality review team who are each state residents with a child under 18; requires the state child fatality review team to distribute the team's annual report to each local education agency and to the board of the Tennessee Chapter of the American Academy of Pediatrics. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 36; Title 37 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 36; Title 37 and Title 68, relative to child fatality review teams.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Effective date(s) 04/11/2024 | |
2024-04-17 | Pub. Ch. 703 | |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-03-28 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-03-25 | House | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-03-25 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-02-29 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/26/2024 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2254 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 703