TN SB2444 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces, from 25 to 15, the maximum class size in grades K-2 at a priority school. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to priority schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/13/2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2349 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-13 - Sponsor(s) Added.