TN SB2443 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates the temporary youth mental health service program. - Amends TCA Title 33 and Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 33 and Title 49, relative to the temporary youth mental health service program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health & Welfare Committee |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2351 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-26 - Failed in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee