TN SB2439 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires each LEA and public charter school governing body to report to the department of education the amount of state and local funds spent on preparing for and administering standardized tests each school year. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires each LEA and public charter school governing body to report to the department of education the amount of state and local funds spent on preparing for and administering standardized tests each school year. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2166 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee of Education Committee