TN SB2430 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 995
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 995
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Municipal Energy Authority Act." - Amends TCA Title 7.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Municipal Energy Authority Act." - Amends TCA Title 7.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 4 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 4 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Pub. Ch. 995 | |
2016-05-02 | Effective date(s) 04/27/2016 | |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2016-04-21 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0975) |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/18/2016 |
2016-04-14 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2016-04-14 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0975) |
2016-04-14 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2016-03-28 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0741) |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/24/2016 |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/14/2016 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2439 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 995