TN SB2422 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes advisory question on the expansion of Medicaid to be placed on the ballot at the regular November election in 2016. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 57 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, authorizes advisory question on the expansion of Medicaid to be placed on the ballot at the regular November election in 2016. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 57 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/21/2016 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/21/2016 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/16/2016 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2545 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-16 - Def. to Summer Study
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2422&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB2422.pdf |