TN SB2415 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits a juvenile court to transfer a child to criminal court to be tried as an adult at any age if the child is charged with a second or subsequent criminal gang offense. - Amends TCA Title 37; Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37; Title 39 and Title 40, relative to transfer of juveniles.
Sponsors
Sen. Art Swann [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/15/2024 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee / Behind Budget |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/18/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/11/2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2471 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/16/2024