TN SB2410 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - Pub. Ch. 661
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - Pub. Ch. 661
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, exempts firefighters in Grainger and Claiborne counties and any municipality located within those counties from the minimum training requirements unless the governing body of a municipality or the county adopts a resolution to apply such requirements within their respective jurisdictional boundaries; makes eligibility to receive pay supplement for completing in-service training course contingent on meeting minimum training requirements. - Amends TCA Section 4-24-112.
Title
As enacted, exempts firefighters in Grainger and Claiborne counties and any municipality located within those counties from the minimum training requirements unless the governing body of a municipality or the county adopts a resolution to apply such requirements within their respective jurisdictional boundaries; makes eligibility to receive pay supplement for completing in-service training course contingent on meeting minimum training requirements. - Amends TCA Section 4-24-112.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Faulk [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 3 MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | Pub. Ch. 661 | |
2010-04-12 | Effective date(s) 03/30/10 | |
2010-03-30 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-03-19 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2010-03-18 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-03-17 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-03-16 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2010-03-15 | S. concurred in H. am. 3 | |
2010-03-15 | S. concurred in H. am. 1 | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on Sen. Message Calendar (1) cal. for 03/15/2010 | |
2010-03-11 | S. Reset on Cal. for 3/15/2010 | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on Sen. Message Calendar (1) cal. for 03/11/2010 | |
2010-03-08 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 65, Nays 25, PNV 6 | |
2010-03-08 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 3 of 0 - HA0987) | |
2010-03-08 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA0942) | |
2010-03-08 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0927) | |
2010-03-08 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2010-02-11 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2010-02-08 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2010-02-08 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2010-02-08 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0818) | |
2010-02-08 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA0819) | |
2010-02-05 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 02/08/2010 | |
2010-02-03 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2010-01-28 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 02/03/2010 | |
2010-01-25 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2010-01-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-05 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2491 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-12 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 661