TN SB2400 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes October 9 of each year as "PANDAS Awareness Day" to promote awareness of Pediatric Autoimmune Neuropsychiatric Disorders Associated with Streptococcal Infections and Pediatric Acute-onset Neuropsychiatric Syndrome. - Amends TCA Title 15.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 15, relative to PANDAS Awareness Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-08 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2024-04-08 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-03-28 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Motion to reconsider adopted. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Motion to lift from the table adopted. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/25/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2524 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-08 - Comp. SB subst.