TN SB2400 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-18 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-18 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, deletes the $350 fee for expunction of criminal records; exempts from the $100 clerks fee for expunction of records, those persons applying for the expunction because the charge or warrant was dismissed in any court as a result of the successful completion of a pretrial diversion program. - Amends TCA Section 8-21-401 and Title 40.
Title
As introduced, deletes the $350 fee for expunction of criminal records; exempts from the $100 clerks fee for expunction of records, those persons applying for the expunction because the charge or warrant was dismissed in any court as a result of the successful completion of a pretrial diversion program. - Amends TCA Section 8-21-401 and Title 40.
Sponsors
Sen. Doug Overbey [R] | Sen. Lee Harris [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-29 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-18 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/18/2016 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/18/2016 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee3 calendar for 4/13/2016 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/13/2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee3 calendar for 4/12/2016 |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/29/2016 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2483 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee