TN SB2396 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 966
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 966
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Investment in Student Achievement (TISA) Act," which replaces the basic education program (BEP) as the system for funding education for the public schools, kindergarten through grade twelve (K-12), beginning with the 2023-2024 school year.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, relative to education funding.
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. Todd Gardenhire [R] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Bill Powers [R] |
Sen. John Stevens [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] | Sen. Shane Reeves [R] | Sen. Bo Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 6, Nays 1 PNV 1 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 6, Nays 1 PNV 1 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 966 | |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 for 4/27/2022 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 2 PNV 0 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/19/2022 |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/19/2022 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/12/2022 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/12/2022 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/6/2022 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/5/2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 6, Nays 1 PNV 1 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2022 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2143 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-06 - Effective date(s) 05/02/2022; 07/01/2022