TN SB2381 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-19 - Conf. comm. report failed, Ayes 46, Nays 36 PNV 6
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-19 - Conf. comm. report failed, Ayes 46, Nays 36 PNV 6
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes, from not less than five days to not less than seven days before a hearing, the time the opposing party has to file a response to a petition under the Tennessee Public Participation Act. - Amends TCA Title 1; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 20; Title 27; Title 28; Title 29; Title 47 and Title 49.
Title
As introduced, changes, from not less than five days to not less than seven days before a hearing, the time the opposing party has to file a response to a petition under the Tennessee Public Participation Act. - Amends TCA Title 1; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 20; Title 27; Title 28; Title 29; Title 47 and Title 49.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Brian Kelsey [R] | Sen. Shane Reeves [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] | Sen. Todd Gardenhire [R] | Sen. Dolores Gresham [R] |
Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. Jon Lundberg [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Sen. John Stevens [R] | Sen. Joseph Hensley [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 45 N: 36 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 49 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 72 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 79 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 4 BY CLEMMONS PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 5 BY CLEMMONS PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 72 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 49 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 72 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 79 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 4 BY CLEMMONS PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 5 BY CLEMMONS PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 72 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-19 | House | Conf. comm. report failed, Ayes 46, Nays 36 PNV 6 |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Conference Committee report adopted, Ayes 24, Nays 5 |
2020-06-18 | House | Conf. comm. appointed. (Curcio, Bricken, Farmer, Shaw) |
2020-06-18 | House | H. refused to recede from am. no. 2 |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed. (Bell, Stevens, Powers, Gresham, Yarbro) |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Senate refused to recede from amendment |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar 2 for 6/18/2020 |
2020-06-17 | House | H. refused to recede from am. no. 2 |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Senate refused to concur in amendment HA #2. |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar 2 for 6/17/2020 |
2020-06-16 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 80, Nays 9, PNV 4 |
2020-06-16 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0935) |
2020-06-16 | House | Am. tabled. (Amendment 4 - HA0955) |
2020-06-16 | House | Am. tabled. (Amendment 5 - HA0956) |
2020-06-16 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - HA0954) |
2020-06-16 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0948) |
2020-06-16 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-06-15 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 26, Nays 0 |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0723) |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0712) |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 3 - SA0724) |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 6/9/2020 |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 6/9/2020 |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 6/2/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2623 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-16 - Comp. SB subst.