TN HB2623 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 23-2)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes, from not less than five days to not less than seven days before a hearing, the time the opposing party has to file a response to a petition under the Tennessee Public Participation Act. - Amends TCA Title 1; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 20; Title 27; Title 28; Title 29; Title 47 and Title 49.
Title
As introduced, changes, from not less than five days to not less than seven days before a hearing, the time the opposing party has to file a response to a petition under the Tennessee Public Participation Act. - Amends TCA Title 1; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 20; Title 27; Title 28; Title 29; Title 47 and Title 49.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Curcio [R] | Rep. Glen Casada [R] | Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] |
Rep. Mary Littleton [R] | Rep. Jason Zachary [R] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] |
Rep. Bob Freeman [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. Johnny Shaw [D] | Rep. Tim Rudd [R] |
Rep. Johnny Garrett [R] | Rep. Rush Bricken [R] | Rep. Clark Boyd [R] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] |
Rep. David Byrd [R] | Rep. Robin Smith [R] | Rep. Pat Marsh [R] | Rep. Martin Daniel [R] |
Rep. Kent Calfee [R] | Rep. Jerome Moon [R] | Rep. Dennis Powers [R] | Rep. Esther Helton-Haynes [R] |
Rep. Mark White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2020-06-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-08 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 6/9/2020 |
2020-06-08 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 6/8/2020 |
2020-06-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 6/2/2020 |
2020-05-28 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2020-05-28 | House | Ref. to Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2381 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-19 - Conf. comm. report failed, Ayes 46, Nays 36 PNV 6