TN SB2379 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, directs the department to submit to the United States department of health and human services a waiver request to exempt this state from the immunization requirements of the National Model Foster Family Home Licensing Standards for Title IV-E agencies; directs the department to submit the waiver request prior to or as part of the department's next occurring Title IV-E program plan application submission. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 37.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4 and Title 37, relative to foster care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2050 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-12 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee