TN SB2374 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Sherry Jones Medical Cannabis Access Act." - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 2; Title 39; Title 43; Title 53, Chapter 11; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 2; Title 39; Title 43; Title 53, Chapter 11; Title 63 and Title 68, to enact the "Sherry Jones Medical Cannabis Access Act."
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2495 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2374&ga=112 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Bill/SB2374.pdf |