TN SB2374 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health & Welfare
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, exempts facilities that are exclusively devoted to the practice of ophthalmology from the certificate of need requirement. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 11, Part 16.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, exempts facilities that are exclusively devoted to the practice of ophthalmology from the certificate of need requirement. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 11, Part 16.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health & Welfare
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/7/2018
2018-02-28SenateAction deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/7/2018
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/28/2018
2018-02-05SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2018-02-01SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2388 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-14 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback