TN SB2370 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Effective date(s) 04/14/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Effective date(s) 04/14/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires, by the 2023-2024 school year, each state college of applied technology to establish partnerships with each LEA that is located in the county in which the main campus of the state college of applied technology is located to provide early postsecondary opportunities for students enrolled in a high school in the LEA; encourages the board of regents to expand the presence of state colleges of applied technology in each county within this state to provide greater early post-secondary opportunities for students enrolled in a high school in an LEA. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to career and technical opportunities.
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Lundberg [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] | Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] |
Sen. Bill Powers [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] | Sen. Page Walley [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Effective date(s) 04/14/2022 | |
2022-04-26 | Pub. Ch. 884 | |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-04-06 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-04-04 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-04-04 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0553) |
2022-04-04 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2022-03-07 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0520) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/3/2022 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/23/2022 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1959 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 884