TN SB2370 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-17 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 20
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-17 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 20
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, creates the position of county attorney.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, creates the position of county attorney.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-17 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 20 | |
2009-05-21 | Comp. HB subst. | |
2009-05-19 | Placed on Sen. Local Bill Calendar cal. for 05/21/2009 | |
2009-05-11 | P2C held on desk. Local Bill | |
2009-05-07 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-05-06 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2403 (Crossfiled) 2009-06-17 - Pr. Ch. 20