TN SB2366 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-18 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-18 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, exempts a person 65 years of age and older from the requirements of showing an identification with a photograph of the voter when signing an application for ballot to vote. - Amends TCA Section 2-7-112.
Title
As introduced, exempts a person 65 years of age and older from the requirements of showing an identification with a photograph of the voter when signing an application for ballot to vote. - Amends TCA Section 2-7-112.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-18 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2012-01-13 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2190 (Crossfiled) 2012-03-14 - Failed In s/c S&LG Subcommittee of State & Local Government Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2366&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB2366.pdf |