TN SB2360 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires law enforcement agencies that receive sexual assault evidence to submit such evidence to the Tennessee bureau of investigation within 10 days of receipt and analyze such evidence within six months, in order to decrease the rape kit backlog throughout the state. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 6, Part 1; Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
As introduced, requires law enforcement agencies that receive sexual assault evidence to submit such evidence to the Tennessee bureau of investigation within 10 days of receipt and analyze such evidence within six months, in order to decrease the rape kit backlog throughout the state. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 6, Part 1; Title 39 and Title 40.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm. |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/25/2014 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/11/2014 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/11/2014 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/25/2014 |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 2/25/2014 |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/18/2014 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1388 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-14 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2360&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB2360.pdf |