TN SB2355 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-03 - Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-03 - Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a records custodian to ensure that the public disclosure of any report of the county medical examiner, toxicological report, or autopsy report complies with HIPAA in accordance with guidance developed by the department of health by rule, unless the document is subject to a subpoena or court order to the contrary. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5; Title 38, Chapter 7; Title 50, Chapter 6; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, requires a records custodian to ensure that the public disclosure of any report of the county medical examiner, toxicological report, or autopsy report complies with HIPAA in accordance with guidance developed by the department of health by rule, unless the document is subject to a subpoena or court order to the contrary. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5; Title 38, Chapter 7; Title 50, Chapter 6; Title 63 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 12/1/2020 |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 6/3/2020 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/25/2020 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/9/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2495 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-11 - Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee