TN SB2335 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases the total acreage a single owner may have classified by the assessor of property as agricultural, forest, or open space land, from 1,500 acres to 5,000 acres, for purposes of greenbelt property taxation. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5.
Title
As introduced, increases the total acreage a single owner may have classified by the assessor of property as agricultural, forest, or open space land, from 1,500 acres to 5,000 acres, for purposes of greenbelt property taxation. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2533 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-02 - Taken off notice for cal. in Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee