TN SB2333 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 932
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 932
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, expands the applicability of the Tourism Development Authority Act to include Shelby County and its municipalities; adds to the powers of a tourism development authority. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 69, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, expands the applicability of the Tourism Development Authority Act to include Shelby County and its municipalities; adds to the powers of a tourism development authority. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 69, Part 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - S. ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES : Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - S. ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES : Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | House | Pub. Ch. 932 |
2014-06-03 | House | Effective date(s) 05/16/2014 |
2014-05-16 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2014-05-08 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2014-05-07 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-05-01 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-21 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-04-15 | House | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0 |
2014-04-15 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA1067) |
2014-04-15 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0704) |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/6/2014 |
2014-03-03 | Senate | S. Reset on S. Regular Calendar for 3/6/14 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 3/3/2014 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Placed on S. Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources cal. for 2/26/2014 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. E,A&NR Comm. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1865 (Crossfiled) 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 932