TN SB2324 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires that a grant awarded to a marina from the portion of gasoline tax revenues apportioned to the wildlife resources fund for public and environmental infrastructure at marinas be based on the amount of gasoline sold at the marina receiving the grant. - Amends TCA Section 67-3-901.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 67-3-901, relative to public and environmental infrastructure at marinas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2024 | |
2024-04-17 | Pub. Ch. 660 | |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-03-28 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-03-28 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0734) |
2024-03-28 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-03-11 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0581) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/7/2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 2/28/2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2095 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 660