TN SB2324 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, specifies that the Tennessee Local Land Bank Program and the Neighborhood Preservation Act do not apply to property tax proceedings, property tax liens, or the enforcement of property tax liens. - Amends TCA Title 13, Chapter 30; Title 13, Chapter 6 and Title 67, Chapter 5.
Title
As introduced, specifies that the Tennessee Local Land Bank Program and the Neighborhood Preservation Act do not apply to property tax proceedings, property tax liens, or the enforcement of property tax liens. - Amends TCA Title 13, Chapter 30; Title 13, Chapter 6 and Title 67, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2207 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-03 - Def. to Summer Study in Property & Planning Subcommittee