TN SB2312 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-19 - Conf. comm. appointed. (Smith, Vaughan, Windle)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, makes various changes to the certificate of need process for healthcare facilities and services. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 11, Part 16.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, makes various changes to the certificate of need process for healthcare facilities and services. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 11, Part 16.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 4 BY CRAWFORD PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 67 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 4 BY CRAWFORD PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 3 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-19HouseConf. comm. appointed. (Smith, Vaughan, Windle)
2020-06-18SenateConference Committee appointed. (Gardenhire, Akbari, Reeves)
2020-06-18SenateSenate refused to recede from its non-concurrence.
2020-06-18HouseH. refused to recede from am. no. 1, 2, 3, 4
2020-06-18SenateSenate refused to concur in House amendments 1,2,3 and 4.
2020-06-18SenatePlaced on Senate Message Calendar 4 for 6/18/2020
2020-06-18HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 68, Nays 23, PNV 0
2020-06-18HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 4 - HA1026)
2020-06-18HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 3 - HA1010)
2020-06-18HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0805)
2020-06-18HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0804)
2020-06-18HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2020-06-11HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2020-06-10SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2020-06-10SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 26, Nays 2
2020-06-10SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0597)
2020-06-10SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 3 - SA0710)
2020-06-10SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0671)
2020-06-09SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 6/10/2020
2020-06-04SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 3 PNV 0
2020-06-03SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 6/4/2020
2020-06-02SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 6/3/2020
2020-05-27SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 6/2/2020
2020-03-11SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0
2020-03-09SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/11/2020
2020-03-09SenateAction deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/11/2020
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/9/2020
2020-02-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2020-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2020-02-04SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2350 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-18 - Comp. SB subst.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback