TN SB2306 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 744
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 744
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, gives licensing authorities discretion whether or not to suspend, deny, or revoke a license based on the applicant or licensee having defaulted or become delinquent on student loan repayment, if the licensing authority determines that the default or delinquency is the result of a medical hardship that prevented the person from working in the person's licensed field and the medical hardship significantly contributed to the default or delinquency. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 23; Title 49; Title 56 and Title 63.
Title
As enacted, gives licensing authorities discretion whether or not to suspend, deny, or revoke a license based on the applicant or licensee having defaulted or become delinquent on student loan repayment, if the licensing authority determines that the default or delinquency is the result of a medical hardship that prevented the person from working in the person's licensed field and the medical hardship significantly contributed to the default or delinquency. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 23; Title 49; Title 56 and Title 63.
Sponsors
Sen. Lee Harris [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-20 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-20 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Pub. Ch. 744 | |
2018-04-23 | Effective date(s) 04/18/2018; 01/01/2019 | |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-04-05 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-04-02 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-04-02 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0961) |
2018-04-02 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2018-03-22 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 1 |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0602) |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0749) |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/19/2018 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/19/18 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/15/2018 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 3/15/18 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/12/2018 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/12/2018 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/5/2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/5/2018 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/1/2018 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/20/2018 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee to 2/20/2018 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/13/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2412 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 744