TN SB2304 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 1, PNV 3
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 1, PNV 3
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a defendant for whom a bench warrant is issued due to failure to appear on a felony or a Class A or Class B misdemeanor that is violent or sexual in nature as determined by the court, or who is charged with a failure to appear, to be placed on any available state or federal list or database as a fugitive from justice, without limitation, within 10 days after the bench warrant is received by law enforcement. - Amends TCA Section 40-11-139 and Section 40-11-142.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 40-11-139 and Section 40-11-142, relative to release of defendants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 1, PNV 3 |
2024-04-24 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA1021) |
2024-04-24 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-04-15 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0967) |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0525) |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/11/2024 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/2/2024 |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/1/2024 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2684 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-24 - Sponsor(s) Added.