TN SB2301 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Pub. Ch. 800
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Pub. Ch. 800
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, designates the Tennessee state museum located at 1000 Rosa L. Parks Boulevard as the "Bill Haslam Center". - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 12.
Title
As enacted, designates the Tennessee state museum located at 1000 Rosa L. Parks Boulevard as the "Bill Haslam Center". - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 12.
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Pub. Ch. 800 | |
2020-07-22 | Effective date(s) 07/15/2020 | |
2020-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-06-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-06-18 | House | Passed H., Ayes 88, Nays 2, PNV 0 |
2020-06-18 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA1000) |
2020-06-18 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0975) |
2020-06-18 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-03-05 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0532) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/2/2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2131 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 800