TN SB2299 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-25 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2022, 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-25 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2022, 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires an LEA or the department of education to provide testing materials or proposed testing materials in the LEA's or department's possession to a member of the general assembly upon the member's request to inspect and review the material; excludes certain materials. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to the general assembly.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | Effective date(s) 05/11/2022, 07/01/2022 | |
2022-05-25 | Pub. Ch. 1032 | |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-05-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-04-25 | House | Passed H., Ayes 69, Nays 25, PNV 0 |
2022-04-25 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0711) |
2022-04-25 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2022-03-31 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 20, Nays 10 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0665) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/28/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2022 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2312 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1032